ID S1343 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to Business
Pending: House Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BARBER AND COSMETOLOGY SERVICES ACT -- Amends S.B. 1324 to revise the definitions of “cosmetology” and “esthetics”.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends S.B. 1324 to revise the definitions of “cosmetology” and “esthetics”.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2018-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-12Senateto House
2018-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 21-14-0
2018-03-09SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-07SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2018-03-07SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback