ID S1341 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Session Law Chapter 287 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CHILD PROTECTIVE ACT -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide more review and oversight for the foster care system in Idaho and to establish Citizen Review Panels and a Child Protection Legislative Review Panel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide more review and oversight for the foster care system in Idaho and to establish Citizen Review Panels and a Child Protection Legislative Review Panel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSession Law Chapter 287 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-20SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-20Houseto Senate
2018-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2018-03-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-16HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-09HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-03-09HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-08Senateto House
2018-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-08SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-08SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-06SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback