ID S1341 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 271 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 271 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to the Sexual Offender Registration Act to remove provisions relating to a certain exemption; to provide a petition process for certain persons to be exempted from the duty to register as a sexual offender, to grant the district court the authority to exempt certain persons from the duty to register as a sexual offender and to allow for expungement.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to the Sexual Offender Registration Act to remove provisions relating to a certain exemption; to provide a petition process for certain persons to be exempted from the duty to register as a sexual offender, to grant the district court the authority to exempt certain persons from the duty to register as a sexual offender and to allow for expungement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 271 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | Shirley & Jaquet | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-1-5 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Block(Block) Absent and excused -- Hagedorn, Lake, Moyle, Roberts, Stevenson Floor Sponsors | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Jud | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | House intro | |
2012-03-05 | to House | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Jud | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | Senate intro |