ID S1340 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to costs of court ordered testing to revise provisions relating to the costs of certain court ordered testing, to provide requirements for the payment of certain court ordered tests and to provide for a waiver of such requirements.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to costs of court ordered testing to revise provisions relating to the costs of certain court ordered testing, to provide requirements for the payment of certain court ordered tests and to provide for a waiver of such requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-1-4 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-05 | to Jud | |
2012-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-05 | House intro | |
2012-03-01 | to House | |
2012-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-2 | |
2012-02-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Jud | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | Senate intro |