ID S1340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to civil actions to provide that certain personal injury actions shall survive the death of an injured party; and to provide for the continuation of certain causes of action relating to personal injury or property damage upon the death of the injured person, to limit damages and to provide for commencement or continuation of such actions by the decedent's personal representative or heirs.
Title
Amends existing law relating to civil actions to provide that certain personal injury actions shall survive the death of an injured party; and to provide for the continuation of certain causes of action relating to personal injury or property damage upon the death of the injured person, to limit damages and to provide for commencement or continuation of such actions by the decedent's personal representative or heirs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-0-6 | |
2010-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-10 | to Jud | |
2010-03-10 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-10 | House intro | |
2010-03-09 | to House | |
2010-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 32-0-3 | |
2010-03-08 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-05 | Rpt engros | |
2010-03-04 | to engros | |
2010-03-04 | Rpt out amen | |
2010-02-25 | to 14th Ord | |
2010-02-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-12 | to Jud | |
2010-02-12 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-11 | to printing | |
2010-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-11 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1340.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1340.pdf |