ID S1338 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PUBLIC RECORDS ACT -- Amends existing law to provide that certain personal information shall be exempt from disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that certain personal information shall be exempt from disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24SenateSession Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-18SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2020-03-18HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2020-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2020-03-17SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2020-03-17Houseto Senate
2020-03-17HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-17HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2020-03-17HouseRead Third Time in Full
2020-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-02HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2020-03-02HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-28Senateto House
2020-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-28SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1
2020-02-27SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2020-02-26SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2020-02-26SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2020-02-26SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-02-25SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2020-02-25SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2020-02-25SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-02-24SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-02-14SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback