ID S1338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC HEALTH DISTRICTS -- Appropriates $10,139,600 to the Public Health Districts for fiscal year 2019.
Title
Appropriates $10,139,600 to the Public Health Districts for fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2018-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-09 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-09 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |