ID S1336 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Ref'd to St Aff
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Ref'd to St Aff
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to worker's compensation to provide that compensation shall be payable for disability or death resulting from certain firefighter occupational diseases, to provide a presumption of proximate causation between specified diseases and employment as a firefighter, to provide for rebuttal of the presumption, to provide for the demonstration of causal connection and to provide that the presumption shall not apply under certain circumstances.
Title
Amends existing law relating to worker's compensation to provide that compensation shall be payable for disability or death resulting from certain firefighter occupational diseases, to provide a presumption of proximate causation between specified diseases and employment as a firefighter, to provide for rebuttal of the presumption, to provide for the demonstration of causal connection and to provide that the presumption shall not apply under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Ref'd to St Aff | |
2012-03-14 | Ret'd to Desk for re-referral | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-13 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-03-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-13 | House intro | |
2012-03-12 | to House | |
2012-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-12 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 23-10-2 | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-05 | to engros | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-02 | to 14th Ord | |
2012-03-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | Senate intro |