ID S1335 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 148 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE -- Appropriates $8,648,100 to the Department of Finance for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 67.00; and provides legislative intent regarding certain continuous appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $8,648,100 to the Department of Finance for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 67.00; and provides legislative intent regarding certain continuous appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateSession Law Chapter 148 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-14SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-13HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-12SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-12SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-09Houseto Senate
2018-03-09HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-09HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-5-7
2018-03-08HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-07HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-06Senateto House
2018-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0
2018-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-01SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback