ID S1333 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that in work involving the expenditure of federal aid funds, specified law shall not be enforced in such a manner as to conflict with or be contrary to the federal statutes prescribing a labor preference to honorably discharged members of the United States armed forces, including airmen.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that in work involving the expenditure of federal aid funds, specified law shall not be enforced in such a manner as to conflict with or be contrary to the federal statutes prescribing a labor preference to honorably discharged members of the United States armed forces, including airmen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/14/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 31-0-4 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |