ID S1332 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 209 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 209 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AMBULANCE SERVICE DISTRICTS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the formation and governance of any new ambulance service districts.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the formation and governance of any new ambulance service districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 209 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 63-2-5 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-4-0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |