ID S1329 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - November 2012, if Ch.97, Laws of 2011, is rejected through voter referendum in General Election
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - November 2012, if Ch.97, Laws of 2011, is rejected through voter referendum in General Election
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain obligations to retirement and social security benefits; to revise a provision relating to pay for performance bonuses for student achievement growth and to revise certain dates relating to certain certificated employees' new employment contracts, and to establish a provision relating to certain administrative employees' award of pay for performance shares.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain obligations to retirement and social security benefits; to revise a provision relating to pay for performance bonuses for student achievement growth and to revise certain dates relating to certain certificated employees' new employment contracts, and to establish a provision relating to certain administrative employees' award of pay for performance shares.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | November 2012, if Ch.97, Laws of 2011, is rejected through voter referendum in General Election | |
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 267 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 2; 07/01/12 All other sections; Sunset Clause | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-3-2 | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-24 | to Educ | |
2012-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-24 | House intro | |
2012-02-23 | to House | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-2 | |
2012-02-20 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-17 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-14 | to Educ | |
2012-02-14 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-13 | to printing | |
2012-02-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-13 | Senate intro |