ID S1329 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 71 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to Idaho Safe Boating Act to revise notice and reporting requirements relating to collisions, accidents and casualties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to Idaho Safe Boating Act to revise notice and reporting requirements relating to collisions, accidents and casualties.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-24 Governor signed Session Law Chapter 71 Effective: 07/01/10
2010-03-18 To Governor
2010-03-17 Sp signed
2010-03-16 Pres signed
2010-03-16 Rpt enrol
2010-03-15 To enrol
2010-03-12 to Senate
2010-03-12 Title apvd
2010-03-12 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5
2010-03-05 to 3rd rdg
2010-03-05 2nd rdg
2010-03-04 to 2nd rdg
2010-03-04 rec d/p
2010-03-04 Rpt out
2010-02-24 to Res/Con
2010-02-24 1st rdg
2010-02-24 House intro
2010-02-23 to House
2010-02-23 Title apvd
2010-02-23 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0
2010-02-19 to 3rd rdg
2010-02-19 2nd rdg
2010-02-18 to 2nd rdg
2010-02-18 rec d/p
2010-02-18 Rpt out
2010-02-10 to Jud
2010-02-10 Rpt prt
2010-02-09 to printing
2010-02-09 1st rdg
2010-02-09 Senate intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback