ID S1326 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Adds to existing law to provide for the crime of aggravated driving while reckless, to provide penalties, and to provide that evidence of conviction shall be admissible in a civil action for damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the crime of aggravated driving while reckless, to provide penalties, and to provide that evidence of conviction shall be admissible in a civil action for damages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18SenateSession Law Chapter 90 Effective: 07/01/2024
2024-03-14SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2024-03-13HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2024-03-13SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2024-03-12SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2024-03-12Houseto Senate
2024-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2024-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-12-0
2024-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2024-03-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2024
2024-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2024-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2024-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2024-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2024-02-27Senateto House
2024-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2024-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-5-1
2024-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2024-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2024-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2024-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback