ID S1326 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 104 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- STATE APPELLATE PUBLIC DEFENDER -- Appropriates $2,948,100 to the State Appellate Public Defender for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 24.00; provides legislative intent for the payment of outside counsel costs; and provides legislative intent for the payment of capital representation costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $2,948,100 to the State Appellate Public Defender for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 24.00; provides legislative intent for the payment of outside counsel costs; and provides legislative intent for the payment of capital representation costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateSession Law Chapter 104 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-09HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-07Houseto Senate
2018-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-2
2018-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-05HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-02Senateto House
2018-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-02SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-28SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback