ID S1323 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 103 Effective: 03/15/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 103 Effective: 03/15/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION -- Appropriates additional moneys to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2018; and reduces the appropriation to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2018.
Title
Appropriates additional moneys to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2018; and reduces the appropriation to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 103 Effective: 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-09 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |