ID S1320 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 348 Effective: 04/12/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 348 Effective: 04/12/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Legend Drug Donation Act to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to the Idaho Legend Drug Donation Act; and to revise provisions relating to the Board of Pharmacy's duties and powers.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Legend Drug Donation Act to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to the Idaho Legend Drug Donation Act; and to revise provisions relating to the Board of Pharmacy's duties and powers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 348 Effective: 04/12/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-0-8 | |
2010-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-25 | to Health/Wel | |
2010-02-25 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-25 | House intro | |
2010-02-24 | to House | |
2010-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-24 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2010-02-22 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2010-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-19 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2010-02-19 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-19 | Rpt engros | |
2010-02-18 | to engros | |
2010-02-18 | Rpt out amen | |
2010-02-16 | to 14th Ord | |
2010-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-08 | to Health/Wel | |
2010-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-05 | to printing | |
2010-02-05 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-05 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1320.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1320.pdf |