ID S1318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

LABOR -- Adds to existing law to establish the Fair Chance Employment Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish the Fair Chance Employment Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-19HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-18HouseFiled for First Reading
2020-03-18HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2020-03-18HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2020-03-18HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-16HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2020-02-24HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2020-02-24HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-21Senateto House
2020-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 21-13-1 -Webb
2020-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback