ID S1318 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 169 Effective: 07/01/2020 SECTION 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CODIFIER'S CORRECTIONS -- Amends existing law to make codifier's corrections, to provide correct code references and to remove obsolete language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to make codifier's corrections, to provide correct code references and to remove obsolete language.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 169 Effective: 07/01/2020 SECTION 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
2018-03-16SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-15SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-14Houseto Senate
2018-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2018-03-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-06Senateto House
2018-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-22SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback