ID S1317 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 03/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- MILITARY DIVISION -- Appropriates an additional $52,000 to the Military Division for FY 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $52,000 to the Military Division for FY 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateSession Law Chapter 90 Effective: 03/14/2018
2018-03-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-07SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-06Houseto Senate
2018-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-1-4
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-28Senateto House
2018-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-28SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Engelking
2018-02-27SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-23SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-22SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback