ID S1315 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 03/13/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- LAVA HOT SPRINGS FOUNDATION -- Appropriates an additional $25,000 to the Lava Hot Springs Foundation for fiscal year 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $25,000 to the Lava Hot Springs Foundation for fiscal year 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateSession Law Chapter 64 Effective: 03/13/2018
2018-03-07SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-07HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-06SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-05SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-9-2
2018-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-26HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-23Senateto House
2018-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1
2018-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-20SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-02-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback