ID S1312 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SAFETY RESTRAINTS - Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the issuance of a certain warning and of a certain citation and to increase a certain fine.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the issuance of a certain warning and of a certain citation and to increase a certain fine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | FAILED -- 8-25-2 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |