ID S1312 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Signed by Governor on 03/13/14 Session Law Chapter 87 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Signed by Governor on 03/13/14 Session Law Chapter 87 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide additional references to the Internal Revenue Code for Public Employee Retirement System purposes.
Title
Amends existing law to provide additional references to the Internal Revenue Code for Public Employee Retirement System purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/13/14 Session Law Chapter 87 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/11/14 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-10 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-06 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2014-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 32-0-3 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |