ID S1311 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DIRECT PRIMARY CARE PILOT PROGRAM -- Adds to existing law to establish the program and to provide a sunset date.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the program and to provide a sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-02-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |