ID S1310 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 347 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 347 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to personal assistance services to revise legislative intent; to revise definitions; to provide for the establishment of annual uniform reimbursement rates for certain agencies, to provide for a certain supplemental component for certain agencies and to provide for the establishment of annual uniform reimbursement rates for certain providers according to a methodology.
Title
Amends existing law relating to personal assistance services to revise legislative intent; to revise definitions; to provide for the establishment of annual uniform reimbursement rates for certain agencies, to provide for a certain supplemental component for certain agencies and to provide for the establishment of annual uniform reimbursement rates for certain providers according to a methodology.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 347 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 60-0-10 | |
2010-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-17 | to Health/Wel | |
2010-02-17 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-17 | House intro | |
2010-02-16 | to House | |
2010-02-16 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-02-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-09 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-09 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-03 | to Health/Wel | |
2010-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-02 | to printing | |
2010-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-02 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1310.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1310.pdf |