ID S1309 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 04/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 04/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FETAL HEARTBEAT PREBORN CHILD PROTECTION ACT -- Amends existing law to revise the prohibitions, penalties, and causes of action of the Fetal Heartbeat Preborn Child Protection Act.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the prohibitions, penalties, and causes of action of the Fetal Heartbeat Preborn Child Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 04/22/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-14-5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-6-1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |