ID S1309 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FIRE DISTRICTS -- Amends and repeals existing law to clarify that certain notice shall be required for temporary vacancy of a commissioner; to revise provisions regarding filling a vacancy; to provide a procedure if available seats on a fire protection board become vacant; and to authorize the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services to make grants to fire districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and repeals existing law to clarify that certain notice shall be required for temporary vacancy of a commissioner; to revise provisions regarding filling a vacancy; to provide a procedure if available seats on a fire protection board become vacant; and to authorize the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services to make grants to fire districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-13Houseto Senate
2018-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-1-5
2018-03-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseReferred to Local Government
2018-03-07HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2018-03-06HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-03-06HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-05Senateto House
2018-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-05SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-03-01SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-21SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback