ID S1308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- Amends existing law to revise age restrictions for persons allowed to serve beer, wine, or liquor.
Title
Amends existing law to revise age restrictions for persons allowed to serve beer, wine, or liquor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-10-2 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |