ID S1306 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

LOCAL LAND USE PLANNING -- Amends existing law to provide for notice to irrigation districts, ground water districts, Carey Act operating companies, nonprofit irrigation entities, lateral ditch associations and drainage districts that have requested to receive notice whenever a county or city considers a proposed subdivision or any other site-specific land development application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for notice to irrigation districts, ground water districts, Carey Act operating companies, nonprofit irrigation entities, lateral ditch associations and drainage districts that have requested to receive notice whenever a county or city considers a proposed subdivision or any other site-specific land development application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateSession Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-19HouseReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-19SenateReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-15Senateto enrol
2018-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-15SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-15SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-15SenateRead second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2018-03-14SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2018-03-14SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2018-03-14SenateReturned from House, amended
2018-03-12Houseto Senate
2018-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-12HouseRead third time in full as amended in House -- PASSED 63-0-7
2018-03-09HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseFiled for First Reading
2018-03-07HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2018-03-07HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-02HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-26Senateto House
2018-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-02-23SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-22SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback