ID S1305 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 176 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

URBAN AGRICULTURE -- Adds to existing law to provide legislative findings and to define terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide legislative findings and to define terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25SenateSession Law Chapter 176 Effective: 07/01/2024
2024-03-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2024-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2024-03-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2024-03-20SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2024-03-20Houseto Senate
2024-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2024-03-20HouseRules Suspended:
2024-03-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2024-03-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2024-03-05HouseRead First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2024-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2024-03-04Senateto House
2024-03-04SenateTitle apvd
2024-03-04SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 32-3-0
2024-02-29SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2024-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2024-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2024-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2024-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2024-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2024-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2024-02-15SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2024-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation
2024-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback