ID S1302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INSURANCE -- Adds to existing law to define a term, to prohibit discrimination against living organ donors, and to provide for enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to define a term, to prohibit discrimination against living organ donors, and to provide for enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-14HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-13SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-12Houseto Senate
2018-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-12-7
2018-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2018-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-27Senateto House
2018-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 24-11-0 -Webb
2018-02-26SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-23SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback