ID S1302 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 02/24/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 02/24/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $25,099,600 additional dedicated and federal funds for fiscal year 2010.
Title
Appropriates $25,099,600 additional dedicated and federal funds for fiscal year 2010.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 02/24/10 | |
2010-02-24 | To Governor | |
2010-02-23 | Sp signed | |
2010-02-22 | Pres signed | |
2010-02-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-02-19 | To enrol | |
2010-02-18 | to Senate | |
2010-02-18 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 60-8-2 | |
2010-02-12 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-12 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-11 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-11 | House intro | |
2010-02-10 | to House | |
2010-02-10 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-10 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2010-02-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-02 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-01 | to Fin | |
2010-02-01 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-29 | to printing | |
2010-01-29 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-29 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1302.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1302.pdf |