ID S1301 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 230 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 230 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CREDIT UNIONS -- Repeals and adds to existing law to establish the Idaho Credit Union Act.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to establish the Idaho Credit Union Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 230 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 65-1-4 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2020-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |