ID S1299 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 108 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 108 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to military education training and service to provide that the State Board of Education, the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho, the Board of Trustees of certain community colleges and the State Board for Professional-Technical Education shall develop policies relating to the award of academic credit for certain military education, training or service; and to provide that each of the professional and occupational licensing boards within the Department of Self-Governing Agencies may accept certain military education, training or service toward the qualifications to receive licensure, certification or registration.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to military education training and service to provide that the State Board of Education, the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho, the Board of Trustees of certain community colleges and the State Board for Professional-Technical Education shall develop policies relating to the award of academic credit for certain military education, training or service; and to provide that each of the professional and occupational licensing boards within the Department of Self-Governing Agencies may accept certain military education, training or service toward the qualifications to receive licensure, certification or registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 108 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-27 | to Educ | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | House intro | |
2012-02-24 | to House | |
2012-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-0-3 | |
2012-02-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-10 | to Educ | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-09 | to printing | |
2012-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-09 | Senate intro |