ID S1298 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORDS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for fingerprint-based criminal background checks of certain applicants and licensees, to provide for the retention and destruction of certain fingerprints and to provide rights for certain fingerprinted individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for fingerprint-based criminal background checks of certain applicants and licensees, to provide for the retention and destruction of certain fingerprints and to provide rights for certain fingerprinted individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-28Senateto House
2018-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-28SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2018-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback