ID S1297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Adds to existing law to provide for a Too Great for Hate license plate.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for a Too Great for Hate license plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | Order ret’d to Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 30-32-8 |
2020-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2020-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-7-0 -Webb |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |