ID S1295 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 341 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding funding for career technical schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding funding for career technical schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 341 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-22Senateto enrol
2018-03-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-22SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 32-0-3
2018-03-22SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-22SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2018-03-22SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-03-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2018-03-22SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2018-03-22SenateReturned from House, amended
2018-03-21Houseto Senate
2018-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-21HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-19HouseFiled for First Reading
2018-03-19HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2018-03-19HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2018-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-14HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-26HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2018-02-26HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-23Senateto House
2018-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback