ID S1293 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide a code reference and to establish provisions regarding limited contracts for certain employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide a code reference and to establish provisions regarding limited contracts for certain employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2018-02-23HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-22Senateto House
2018-02-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-22SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback