ID S1292 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ADVANCED OPPORTUNITIES SCHOLARSHIP -- Amends existing law to revise eligibility and reimbursement requirements for courses and credits that qualify for the Advanced Opportunities Scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise eligibility and reimbursement requirements for courses and credits that qualify for the Advanced Opportunities Scholarship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateSession Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-09HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-07Houseto Senate
2018-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-2
2018-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-01HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2018-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-28Senateto House
2018-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-28SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-02-26SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-02-23SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-02-23SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-22SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-02-22SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-02-22SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-16SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback