ID S1292 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to execution to provide that the infliction of the punishment of death shall not be construed as the practice of medicine, to provide certain exemptions and to provide that certain persons and entities are not subject to criminal or civil liability.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to execution to provide that the infliction of the punishment of death shall not be construed as the practice of medicine, to provide certain exemptions and to provide that certain persons and entities are not subject to criminal or civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 01/01/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-14 | To enrol | |
2012-03-13 | to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-2-5 | |
2012-02-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Jud | |
2012-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-22 | House intro | |
2012-02-21 | to House | |
2012-02-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-1-2 | |
2012-02-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to Jud | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-07 | to printing | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | Senate intro |