ID S1291 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

SCHOOL TURNAROUND ACT -- Adds to existing law to enact the School Turnaround Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to enact the School Turnaround Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseU.C. to be returned to Education Committee
2018-03-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2018-03-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-07Senateto House
2018-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-07SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 28-7-0
2018-03-07SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-07SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-03-06SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-03-06SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-03-06SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-06SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-03-06SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-03-06SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-02SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback