ID S1290 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to drainage districts to provide for reapportionment of certain benefits and to revise provisions relating to the apportionment of estimates of the cost of maintenance of drainage districts' drainage systems.
Title
Amends existing law relating to drainage districts to provide for reapportionment of certain benefits and to revise provisions relating to the apportionment of estimates of the cost of maintenance of drainage districts' drainage systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-27 | to Res/Con | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | House intro | |
2012-02-24 | to House | |
2012-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-0-3 | |
2012-02-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-20 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-20 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-07 | to Res/Env | |
2012-02-07 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-06 | to printing | |
2012-02-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-06 | Senate intro |