ID S1283 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 277 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ADMINISTRATIVE RULES -- Amends existing law to provide for a petition for a waiver or variance from an administrative rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for a petition for a waiver or variance from an administrative rule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24SenateSession Law Chapter 277 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-19SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2020-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2020-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2020-03-18SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2020-03-18Houseto Senate
2020-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-18HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4
2020-03-18HouseRead Third Time in Full
2020-03-17HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-20HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2020-02-20HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-19Senateto House
2020-02-19SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-3-0
2020-02-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-05SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback