ID S1283 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Repeals and adds to existing law to prohibit persons from operating a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and adds to existing law to prohibit persons from operating a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateFiled in Office of the Secretary of Senate
2018-02-28SenateRead third time in full as amended -- FAILED 13-22-0
2018-02-26SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-02-23SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-02-23SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-22SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-02-22SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-02-22SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-21SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback