ID S1278 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DRIVER TRAINING -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reimbursement from the Driver Training Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reimbursement from the Driver Training Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2020-02-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-13Senateto House
2020-02-13SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-13SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 24-10-1 -Engelking
2020-02-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-03SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2020-01-31SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback