ID S1278 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor on 03/23/16 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor on 03/23/16 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER - Amends existing law to provide that a person or entity operating a canal or conduit for irrigation or other beneficial uses authorized by a water right that permits water to be diverted from a natural watercourse for such purposes shall not be required to obtain an additional water right for the incidental use of that same water where the water is diverted for irrigation or other beneficial use and thereafter used to generate hydroelectricity in the canal or conduit, to provide conditions, to provide that the incidental hydropower use shall be junior to and fully subordinated to all existing and future uses, and shall be nonconsumptive and to provide for certain written notice.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a person or entity operating a canal or conduit for irrigation or other beneficial uses authorized by a water right that permits water to be diverted from a natural watercourse for such purposes shall not be required to obtain an additional water right for the incidental use of that same water where the water is diverted for irrigation or other beneficial use and thereafter used to generate hydroelectricity in the canal or conduit, to provide conditions, to provide that the incidental hydropower use shall be junior to and fully subordinated to all existing and future uses, and shall be nonconsumptive and to provide for certain written notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/23/16 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 11:50 a.m. on 03/18/16 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-15 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2016-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-29 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2016-02-29 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |