ID S1275 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INSURANCE -- Adds to existing law to provide for the availability of a six-month supply of contraceptive drugs and supplies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the availability of a six-month supply of contraceptive drugs and supplies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateFiled in Office of the Secretary of Senate
2020-02-17SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 13-20-2 -Webb
2020-02-10SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-03SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2020-01-31SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback