ID S1272 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 78 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 78 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to telegraphs to delete provisions relating to telegraphing and to provide that a warrant of arrest may be sent by certain processes; and repealing existing law relating to telegraphic copies of warrants and telegraphic communications.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to telegraphs to delete provisions relating to telegraphing and to provide that a warrant of arrest may be sent by certain processes; and repealing existing law relating to telegraphic copies of warrants and telegraphic communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 78 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-14 | To enrol | |
2012-03-13 | to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-0-7 | |
2012-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Jud | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | House intro | |
2012-02-14 | to House | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-02-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-09 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-01 | to Jud | |
2012-02-01 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-31 | to printing | |
2012-01-31 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-31 | Senate intro |