ID S1271 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH CARE -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “health care organization” and to revise provisions regarding exceptions to privilege and confidentiality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definition of “health care organization” and to revise provisions regarding exceptions to privilege and confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateSession Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-08Houseto Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-20Senateto House
2018-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-02-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-07SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback