ID S1270 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FORCIBLE PENETRATION -- Amends existing law to revise the conditions for committing the crime of forcible penetration by a foreign object.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the conditions for committing the crime of forcible penetration by a foreign object.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-22SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-21Houseto Senate
2018-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-03-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-06Senateto House
2018-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-06SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-06SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-05SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-01SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-20SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-07SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback